Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Atcherley Cardinal Dew

Archbishop Emeritus of Wellington, New Zealand

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Ippolito


Motto: Pax Iustitiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1948 Born
9 May 197628.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wellington, New Zealand
1 Apr 199546.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wellington, New Zealand
1 Apr 199546.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Privata
31 May 199547.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Privata
24 May 200456.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Wellington, New Zealand
21 Mar 200556.8SucceededArchbishop of Wellington, New Zealand
1 Apr 200556.9AppointedBishop of New Zealand, Military
14 Feb 201566.7Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 201566.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Ippolito
29 Nov 201567.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Ippolito
4 Oct 201971.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Palmerston North, New Zealand
5 May 202375.0RetiredArchbishop of Wellington, New Zealand
27 May 202375.0RetiredBishop of New Zealand, Military
30 Sep 202375.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Palmerston North, New Zealand

MicroData Summary
John Atcherley Dew
John Atcherley Cardinal Dew
(born )
Archbishop Emeritus of Wellington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaipawa, Archdiocese of Wellington
Ordained PriestWaipukurarau
Ordained BishopTown Hall, Wellington, Archdiocese of Wellington

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Wellington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,562
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015
  • i: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2015
  • aadm: CB, 5 Oct 2019
  • r: Bollettino, 5 May 2023
  • r: Bollettino, 27 May 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025