Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Baltazar Enrique Cardinal Porras Cardozo

Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni Evangelista e Petronio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1944 Born
30 Oct 196622.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Calabozo, Venezuela
30 Jul 196722.8Ordained PriestPriest of Calabozo, Venezuela
23 Jul 198338.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mérida, Venezuela
23 Jul 198338.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamdia
17 Sep 198338.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamdia
30 Oct 199147.0AppointedArchbishop of Mérida, Venezuela
5 Dec 199147.1InstalledArchbishop of Mérida, Venezuela
19 Nov 201672.1Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 201672.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni Evangelista e Petronio
11 Jun 201772.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni Evangelista e Petronio
9 Jul 201873.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
17 Jan 202378.2AppointedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
28 Jan 202378.2InstalledArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
31 Jan 202378.3RetiredArchbishop of Mérida, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Baltazar Enrique Porras Cardozo
(VIAF: 69045295; WikiData: Q303314)
Baltazar Enrique Cardinal Porras Cardozo (born ) Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Ordained DeaconTodos Los Santos, Cathedral, Calabozo, Diocese of Calabozo
Ordained PriestTodos Los Santos, Cathedral, Calabozo, Diocese of Calabozo
Ordained BishopSte. Catherine, Cathedral, Mérida, Archdiocese of Mérida

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2016
  • i: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2017
  • aadm: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,747
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2023
  • r/od/c0: CB, 17 Jan 2023
  • i: CB, 28 Jan 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 11 Jan 2024