Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal Nguyễn Văn Nhơn

Archbishop Emeritus of H Nội, Viet Nam

Cardinal-Priest of San Tommaso Apostolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1938 Born
21 Dec 196729.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lạt, Viet Nam
11 Oct 199153.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lạt, Viet Nam
3 Dec 199153.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Lạt, Viet Nam
23 Mar 199455.9SucceededBishop of Lạt, Viet Nam
22 Apr 201072.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of H Nội, Viet Nam
13 May 201072.1SucceededArchbishop of H Nội, Viet Nam
14 Feb 201576.8Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 201576.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso Apostolo
6 Dec 201577.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso Apostolo
17 Nov 201880.6RetiredArchbishop of H Nội, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pierre Nguyễn Văn Nhơn
Pierre Cardinal Nguyễn Văn Nhơn (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of H Nội

EventPlace
Birth Place Lat, Diocese of Lạt
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lat, Diocese of Lạt

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of H Nội.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2010
  • s: Bollettino, 13 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,649
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015
  • i: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2015
  • c1: CB, 14 Jun 2016
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast