Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Virgilio do Carmo da Silva, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Díli, Timor-Leste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1967 Born
31 May 199022.5ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
19 Mar 199729.3Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
18 Dec 199831.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
30 Jan 201648.1AppointedBishop of Díli, Timor-Leste
19 Mar 201648.3Ordained BishopBishop of Díli, Timor-Leste
11 Sep 201951.7AppointedArchbishop of Díli, Timor-Leste

MicroData Summary for Virgilio do Carmo da Silva
Archbishop Virgilio do Carmo da Silva S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Díli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenilale
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Tasi Tolu, Dili, Diocese of Díli

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Díli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2016
  • ob: CB, 1 Feb 2016
  • c2+: CB, 18 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,867

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast