Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alvaro Leonel Cardinal Ramazzini Imeri

Bishop of Huehuetenango, Guatemala

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Evangelista a Spinaceto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1947 Born
27 Jun 197123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Guatemala
15 Dec 198841.4AppointedBishop of San Marcos, Guatemala
6 Jan 198941.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Marcos, Guatemala
14 May 201264.8AppointedBishop of Huehuetenango, Guatemala
14 Jul 201264.9InstalledBishop of Huehuetenango, Guatemala
5 Oct 201972.2Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 201972.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Evangelista a Spinaceto

MicroData Summary for Alvaro Leonel Ramazzini Imeri (VIAF: 46586496)
Alvaro Leonel Cardinal Ramazzini Imeri (born ) Bishop of Huehuetenango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiudad de Guatemala, Archdiocese of Guatemala
Ordained PriestSt. James, Cathedral, Ciudad de Guatemala, Archdiocese of Guatemala
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of Huehuetenango.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,032
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 May 2012
  • card: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2019
  • cpri: Bollettino, 5 Oct 2019
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast