Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan de la Caridad Cardinal García Rodríguez

Archbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Aquila e Priscilla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1948 Born
25 Jan 197223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Camagüey, Cuba
15 Mar 199748.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Camagüey, Cuba
15 Mar 199748.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari
7 Jun 199748.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari
10 Jun 200253.9AppointedArchbishop of Camagüey, Cuba
26 Apr 201667.7AppointedArchbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
22 May 201667.8InstalledArchbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
5 Oct 201971.2Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 201971.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Aquila e Priscilla

MicroData Summary for Juan de la Caridad García Rodríguez
Juan de la Caridad Cardinal García Rodríguez (born ) Archbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamagüey, Diocese of Camagüey
Ordained PriestMorón, Church, Camagüey, Diocese of Camagüey
Ordained BishopLa Merced, Church, Camaguëy, Diocese of Camagüey

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,011
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2016
  • c1: CB, 26 Apr 2016
  • card: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2019
  • cpri: Bollettino, 5 Oct 2019
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast