Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Cardinal Njue

Archbishop Emeritus of Nairobi, Kenya

Cardinal-Priest of Preziosissimo Sangue di Nostro Signore Gesł Cristo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1944² Born
6 Jan 197329.0Ordained PriestPriest of Meru, Kenya
9 Jun 198642.4AppointedBishop of Embu, Kenya
20 Sep 198642.7Ordained BishopBishop of Embu, Kenya
9 Mar 200258.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Nyeri, Kenya
6 Oct 200763.7AppointedArchbishop of Nairobi, Kenya
1 Nov 200763.8InstalledArchbishop of Nairobi, Kenya
24 Nov 200763.8Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 200763.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Preziosissimo Sangue di Nostro Signore Gesł Cristo
17 Feb 200864.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Preziosissimo Sangue di Nostro Signore Gesł Cristo
4 Jan 202177.0RetiredArchbishop of Nairobi, Kenya

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Njue
(WikiData: Q470625)
John Cardinal Njue (born 1944) Archbishop Emeritus of Nairobi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEmbu, Prefecture Apostolic of Meru
Ordained PriestSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopStadium, Embu, Diocese of Embu

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Nairobi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 100, Number 8,666
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2021
  • opd: CB, 11 Apr 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 2 Oct 2023