Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio María Cardinal Rouco Varela

Archbishop Emeritus of Madrid, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1936 Born
28 Mar 195922.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain
17 Sep 197640.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
17 Sep 197640.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gergis
31 Oct 197640.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gergis
9 May 198447.7AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
28 Jul 199457.9AppointedArchbishop of Madrid, Spain
21 Feb 199861.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 199861.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
11 Oct 199862.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
28 Aug 201478.0RetiredArchbishop of Madrid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio María Rouco Varela (VIAF: 41764505)
Antonio María Cardinal Rouco Varela (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Madrid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillalba
Ordained BishopSantiago de Compostela, Cathedral, Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Madrid.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Bollettino, 29 Sep 1998
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,385

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast