Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luis José Cardinal Rueda Aparicio

Archbishop of Bogotá, Colombia

Cardinal-Priest of San Luca a Via Prenestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1962 Born
23 Nov 198826.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
23 Nov 198927.7Ordained PriestPriest of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
2 Feb 201249.9AppointedBishop of Montelibano, Colombia
14 Apr 201250.1Ordained BishopBishop of Montelibano, Colombia
28 Apr 201250.1InstalledBishop of Montelibano, Colombia
19 May 201856.2AppointedArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia
7 Jul 201856.3InstalledArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia
25 Apr 202058.1AppointedArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
11 Jun 202058.2InstalledArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
13 May 202159.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Soacha, Colombia
25 Jun 202260.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Soacha, Colombia
30 Sep 202361.5Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 202361.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Luca a Via Prenestina

MicroData Summary for Luis José Rueda Aparicio
(WikiData: Q1876444)
Luis José Cardinal Rueda Aparicio (born ) Archbishop of Bogotá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Gil, Diocese of Socorro y San Gil
Ordained DeaconSanta Cruz, Cathedral, San Gil, Diocese of Socorro y San Gil
Ordained PriestSanta Cruz, Cathedral, San Gil, Diocese of Socorro y San Gil
Ordained BishopSanta Cruz, Cathedral, San Gil, Diocese of Socorro y San Gil

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Bogotá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2012
  • c1: CB, 2 Feb 2012
  • ob/i: CB, 4 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 Feb 2012
  • ob: CB, 29 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,418
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 May 2018
  • i: CB, 23 Jul 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2020
  • i: CB, 27 Apr 2020
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2023
  • od/loc: CB, 22 Aug 2023
  • cpri: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 25 May 2024