Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cardinal-Bishops

by rank

RankVBirthdateAgeElevatedYrsThis TitleYrsNameCardinal Title
1No30 Jan 1934 21 Feb 2001 1 Oct 2002 Giovanni Battista Cardinal ReSabina-Poggio Mirteto
18 Jan 2020 Giovanni Battista Cardinal ReOstia
2Yes18 Nov 1943 24 Nov 2007 28 Jun 2018 Leonardo Cardinal SandriSanti Biagio e Carlo ai Catinari
3No23 Nov 1927 28 Jun 1991 10 Jan 1994 Angelo Cardinal SodanoAlbano
4No1 Nov 1932 25 May 1985 25 Apr 2005 Francis Cardinal ArinzeVelletri-Segni
5No2 Dec 1934 21 Oct 2003 10 May 2008 Tarcisio Pietro Evasio Cardinal Bertone, S.D.B.Frascati
6No6 Jan 1932 21 Feb 2001 24 Feb 2009 José Cardinal Saraiva Martins, C.M.F.Palestrina
7Yes17 Jan 1955 22 Feb 2014 28 Jun 2018 Pietro Cardinal ParolinSanti Simone e Giuda Taddeo a Torre Angela
8Yes8 Jun 1944 21 Oct 2003 28 Jun 2018 Marc Armand Cardinal Ouellet, P.S.S.Santa Maria in Traspontina
9Yes15 Apr 1946 18 Feb 2012 28 Jun 2018 Fernando Cardinal FiloniNostra Signora di Coromoto in San Giovanni di Dio
10Yes18 Aug 1941 22 Feb 2014 1 May 2020 Beniamino Cardinal StellaPorto-Santa Rufina
11Yes21 Jun 1957 24 Nov 2012 1 May 2020 Luis Antonio Gokim Cardinal TagleSan Felice da Cantalice a Centocelle

Cardinal-Bishop Patriarchs

RankVBirthdateAgeElevatedYrsNameCardinal Title
12No18 Mar 1935 20 Nov 2010 Antonios Cardinal NaguibPatriarch Emeritus of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
13No25 Feb 1940 24 Nov 2012 Béchara Boutros Cardinal Raï, O.M.M.Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
14Yes4 Jul 1948 28 Jun 2018 Louis Raphaël I Cardinal SakoPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq

Notes: Cardinals that reach the age of 80 before the day the Holy See becomes vacant may not vote in a conclave.
Those currently eligible have 'Yes' in the column marked 'V'.
14 Cardinal-Bishops of 221 living Cardinals. This table was last updated on 17 Jul 2020.

Cardinal-Priests (172)

Cardinal-Deacons (35)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Jul 2020

Quantcast