Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Justin Francis Cardinal Rigali

Archbishop Emeritus of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1935 Born
25 Apr 196126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
8 Jun 198550.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Volsinium
8 Jun 198550.1AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
14 Sep 198550.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Volsinium
21 Dec 198954.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Bishops
2 Jan 199054.7AppointedSecretary of the College of Cardinals
25 Jan 199458.7AppointedArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
16 Mar 199458.9InstalledArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
15 Jul 200368.2AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
7 Oct 200368.4InstalledArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
21 Oct 200368.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200368.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
19 Jul 201176.2RetiredArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Justin Francis Rigali
(VIAF: 41208131; WikiData: Q503833)
Justin Francis Cardinal Rigali (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Angeles, CA, Diocese of Los Angeles-San Diego, California
Ordained PriestSaint Vibiana, Cathedral, Los Angeles, CA, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, California
Ordained BishopSt. Pancrace, Basilica, Albano, Suburbicarian See of Albano, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Philadelphia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 93, Number 7,919
  • c1.loc: CB, 18 Oct 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 17 Jun 2024