Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Óscar Andrés Cardinal Rodríguez Maradiaga, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Speranza

Coordinator of the Council of Cardinals


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1942 Born
3 May 196118.3Solemn VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
28 Jun 197027.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
28 Oct 197835.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras
28 Oct 197835.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
8 Dec 197835.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
1981²38.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras
17 Mar 198441.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras
1993²50.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of San Pedro Sula, Honduras
8 Jan 199350.0AppointedArchbishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras
3 Feb 199552.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of San Pedro Sula, Honduras
21 Feb 200158.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200158.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Speranza
27 May 200158.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Speranza
13 Apr 201370.2AppointedCoordinator of the Council of Cardinals

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Óscar Andrés Rodríguez Maradiaga (VIAF: 65111397)
Óscar Andrés Cardinal Rodríguez Maradiaga S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Tegucigalpa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTegucigalpa, Archdiocese of Tegucigalpa
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora De Suyapa, Tegucigalpa, Archdiocese of Tegucigalpa

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Tegucigalpa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,890
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Number 5,477

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Mar 2021

Quantcast