Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Manuel Cardinal Monteiro de Castro

Major Penitentiary Emeritus of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Cardinal-Deacon of San Domenico di Guzman


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1938 Born
9 Jul 196123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Braga, Portugal
16 Feb 198546.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Beneventum
16 Feb 198546.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Bahamas, Antilles
16 Feb 198546.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Barbados, Antilles
16 Feb 198546.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Belize, Antilles
16 Feb 198546.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Dominica, Antilles
16 Feb 198546.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Grenada, Antilles
16 Feb 198546.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Jamaica, Antilles
16 Feb 198546.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Saint Lucia, Antilles
16 Feb 198546.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
23 Mar 198546.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Beneventum
25 Apr 198749.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Antigua and Barbuda, Antilles
21 Aug 199052.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to El Salvador
21 Aug 199052.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
12 Apr 199153.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
2 Feb 199859.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to South Africa
2 Feb 199859.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Namibia
2 Feb 199859.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Swaziland
7 Mar 199859.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lesotho
1 Mar 200061.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
1 Mar 200061.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Andorra
3 Jul 200971.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Bishops
21 Oct 200971.5AppointedSecretary of the College of Cardinals
5 Jan 201273.7AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
18 Feb 201273.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Domenico di Guzman
18 Feb 201273.8Elevated to Cardinal
22 Apr 201274.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Domenico di Guzman
21 Sep 201375.4RetiredMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

MicroData Summary for Manuel Monteiro de Castro (VIAF: 270534159)
Manuel Cardinal Monteiro de Castro (born ) Major Penitentiary Emeritus of Apostolic Penitentiary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Eufémia de Prazins, Portugal
Ordained PriestCathedral, Braga, Archdiocese of Braga, Portugal
Ordained BishopSameiro, Basilica, Braga, Archdiocese of Braga, Portugal

Please contact the Cardinal through the Apostolic Penitentiary.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2012
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1p15: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,642

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 27 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Jan 2021

Quantcast