Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-Pierre Bernard Cardinal Ricard

Archbishop Emeritus of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino

Member of the Council for the Economy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1944 Born
5 Oct 196824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Marseille, France
17 Apr 199348.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Grenoble, France
17 Apr 199348.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pulcheriopolis
6 Jun 199348.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pulcheriopolis
4 Jul 199651.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
6 Sep 199651.9SucceededBishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
21 Dec 200157.2AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
24 Mar 200661.4Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 200661.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
8 Oct 200662.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
8 Mar 201469.4AppointedMember of the Council for the Economy
1 Oct 201975.0RetiredArchbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Bernard Ricard (VIAF: 76539125)
Jean-Pierre Bernard Cardinal Ricard (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bordeaux (-Bazas)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseille, Archdiocese of Marseille
Ordained PriestSaint-Martin, Church, Gémenos, Archdiocese of Marseille
Ordained BishopSainte-Marie-Majeure, Cathedral, Marseille, Archdiocese of Marseille

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Bordeaux (-Bazas).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,077
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2014
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2019
  • loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast