Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Maria Cardinal Vegli˛

President Emeritus of the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development

Cardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio

Note(s): (President Emeritus of P.C. for Pastoral Care of Migrants...)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1938 Born
18 Mar 196224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Pesaro, Italy
27 Jul 198547.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aeclanum
27 Jul 198547.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Papua New Guinea
27 Jul 198547.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Solomon Islands
6 Oct 198547.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Aeclanum
21 Oct 198951.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to SÚnÚgal
21 Oct 198951.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Guinea-Bissau
21 Oct 198951.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Cape Verde
21 Oct 198951.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Mali
Dec 199456.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to SÚnÚgal
Dec 199456.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guinea-Bissau
Dec 199456.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cape Verde
Dec 199456.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mali
2 Oct 199759.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lebanon
2 Oct 199759.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kuwait
2 Oct 199759.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Arabian Peninsula
13 Dec 199961.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Kuwait
13 Dec 199961.8ResignedApostolic Delegate to Arabian Peninsula
11 Apr 200163.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
28 Feb 200971.0AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
18 Feb 201274.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
18 Feb 201274.0Elevated to Cardinal
10 Jun 201274.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
28 Feb 201375.0CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
16 Mar 201375.1ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
1 Jan 201778.9CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
4 Mar 202284.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Vegli˛
(VIAF: 182151246506244130055; WikiData: Q517279)
Antonio Maria Cardinal Vegli˛ (born ) President Emeritus of Promoting Integral Human Development

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacerata Feltria, Diocese of Montefeltro, Italy
Ordained PriestCathedral, Pesaro, Diocese of Pesaro, Italy
Ordained Bishopdella Assunzione, Cathedral, Pesaro, Diocese of Pesaro, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1c01: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2012
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 94, Number 8,037
  • cpri: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024