Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Josip Cardinal Bozanić

Archbishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Cardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1949 Born
29 Jun 197526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
10 May 198940.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
25 Jun 198940.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
14 Nov 198940.6SucceededBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
5 Jun 199647.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia
22 Nov 199647.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia
5 Jul 199748.2AppointedArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia
4 Oct 199748.5InstalledArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia
21 Oct 200354.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200354.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
27 Feb 200555.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati

MicroData Summary for Josip Bozanić (VIAF: 4872964)
Josip Cardinal Bozanić (born ) Archbishop of Zagreb

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRijeka, Diocese of Rijeka (-Opatija)
Ordained PriestAssunzione della Beata Vergine Maria, Cathedral, Krk, Diocese of Krk (Veglia)
Ordained BishopAssunzione della Beata Vergine Maria, Cathedral, Krk, Diocese of Krk (Veglia)

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Zagreb.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,772
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • loc/i: AM, 25 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast