Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Baptist Geisler

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Odessus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1882Born
13 Mar 191027.8Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
2 Apr 193047.9AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
25 May 193048.0Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
23 Apr 195270.0ResignedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
23 Apr 195270.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Odessus
5 Sep 195270.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist Geisler
Archbishop Johann Baptist Geisler (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMayrhofen

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast