Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ernest Gandolph von Kuenburg

Deceased

Bishop of Lavant, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1737Born
176527.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
20 Feb 179052.7SelectedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
7 Mar 179052.8ConfirmedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
14 Mar 179052.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
1 Dec 179356.5DiedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ernest Gandolph von Kuenburg
Bishop Joseph Ernest Gandolph von Kuenburg (born , died ) Bishop of Lavant

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGraz
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a priest for 28.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 255
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,695
  • ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast