Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sigmund von Volkersdorf

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1395¹Born
10 Apr 145257.2SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
9 Jun 145257.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
6 Aug 145257.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
3 Nov 146166.8DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sigmund von Volkersdorf (VIAF: 232760984)
Archbishop Sigmund von Volkersdorf (born 1395, died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,608
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 228
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,599
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1452, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast