Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Matthäus Cardinal Lang von Wellenburg

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1468BornAugsburg
150133.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Gurk, Austria
6 Oct 150537.8SucceededBishop of Gurk, Austria
30 Sep 151042.7AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
10 Mar 151143.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
5 Apr 151244.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria
24 Nov 151244.9Elevated to Cardinal
22 Mar 151446.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
28 Jun 151951.5SucceededArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
8 Aug 151951.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
24 Sep 151951.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 151951.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
11 Mar 152254.2ResignedBishop of Gurk, Austria
26 Feb 153567.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
8 Nov 153567.9AppointedAdministrator of Chiemsee, Germany
153668.0ResignedAdministrator of Chiemsee, Germany
30 Mar 154072.2DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Matthäus Lang von Wellenburg:
Cardinal Matthäus Lang von Wellenburg (died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a priest for 20.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
  • a cardinal for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1511
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 165
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 33, Number 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Nov 2013