Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert von Törring

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1578BornStein
30 May 161031.5Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
22 Oct 161334.9SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
17 Feb 161435.3ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
20 Apr 161435.4Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
12 Apr 164970.4DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Albert von Törring:
Bishop Albert von Törring (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 292
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 18 Feb 2015