Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ernst von Bayern

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1500Born
28 Jan 151716.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Passau, Germany
21 May 154039.9AppointedBishop of Salzburg, Austria
21 May 154039.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Salzburg, Austria
16 Jul 155454.0ResignedBishop-Elect of Salzburg, Austria
16 Jul 155454.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Salzburg, Austria
7 Dec 156060.4DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Ernst von Bayern (VIAF: 57415353)
Father Ernst von Bayern (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünchen

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 291, and Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast