Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andreas Laun, O.S.F.S.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Salzburg, Austria

Titular Bishop of Libertina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1942 Born
17 Sep 196320.9ProfessedMember of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
17 Sep 196623.9Solemn VowsMember of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
29 Jun 196724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
25 Jan 199552.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
25 Jan 199552.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Libertina
25 Mar 199552.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Libertina
13 Oct 201775.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Andreas Laun (VIAF: 29577873)
Bishop Andreas Laun O.S.F.S. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Salzburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,503
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast