Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georg von Kuenburg

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1542Born
18 Jul 158038.1SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria
7 Nov 158038.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria
4 May 158643.9SucceededArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
5 Oct 158644.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
25 Jan 158744.6DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Georg von Kuenburg (VIAF: 101294126)
Archbishop Georg von Kuenburg (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoosham
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast