Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wenzeslaus Ignaz von Deym

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg

Titular Bishop of Halmiros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1734BornCzettorcen
26 Mar 180469.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
26 Mar 180469.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Halmiros
22 May 180469.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halmiros
9 Sep 181681.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Wenzeslaus Ignaz von Deym:
Bishop Wenzeslaus Ignaz von Deym (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013