Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Stieff von Kränzen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gurk

Titular Bishop of Sulmacen


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jun 1654Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
12 Nov 1685AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gurk, Austria
12 Nov 1685AppointedTitular Bishop of Sulmacen
17 Jun 1694DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johann Stieff von Kränzen:
Bishop Johann Stieff von Kränzen (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gurk

  • a priest for 39.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 366
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015