Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jérôme Joseph Franz de Paula Colloredo von Wallsee und Mels

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1732Born
6 Feb 176128.6Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
19 Dec 176129.5SelectedBishop of Gurk, Austria
8 May 176229.9ConfirmedBishop of Gurk, Austria
9 May 176229.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
14 Mar 177239.7SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
22 Jun 177240.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
20 May 181279.9DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Jérôme Joseph Franz de Paula Colloredo von Wallsee und Mels
Archbishop Jérôme Joseph Franz de Paula Colloredo von Wallsee und Mels (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 50.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 232, and Page 364
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,231

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast