Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignaz Franz Stanislaus von Spaur

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1729³Born
28 Dec 175526.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salzburg, Austria
1 Feb 175626.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
23 Jun 177546.1SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
18 Dec 177546.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
18 Dec 177546.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
17 Nov 177647.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
31 Dec 177849.6SucceededBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
2 Mar 177949.8DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignaz Franz Stanislaus von Spaur
Bishop Ignaz Franz Stanislaus von Spaur (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInnsbruck
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a priest for 23.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 131, and Page 164
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,658
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,395

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast