Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Balthasar Kaltner

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1844BornGoldegg im Pongau
26 Jul 186824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
15 Apr 190157.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
15 Apr 190157.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
12 May 190157.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
3 Nov 191066.6AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
20 Nov 191066.6InstalledBishop of Gurk, Austria
2 Apr 191470.0SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
25 May 191470.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
5 Jul 191470.2InstalledArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
8 Jul 191874.2DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Balthasar Kaltner:
Archbishop Balthasar Kaltner (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 81
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1901, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013