Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Franz von Preysing-Hohenaschau

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1615Born
166852.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
4 Feb 167054.9AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
25 Jul 167055.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
8 Jul 168772.3DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Franz von Preysing-Hohenaschau
Bishop Johann Franz von Preysing-Hohenaschau (born , died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünchen

  • a priest for 19.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 157
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast