Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ehrenfried von Kuenburg

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573Born
160330.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
14 Sep 161037.7AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
26 Sep 161037.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
9 Dec 161845.9DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ehrenfried von Kuenburg
Bishop Ehrenfried von Kuenburg (born 1573, died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVahenlueg
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a priest for 15.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 148
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 20
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,851

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast