Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph von Stubenberg

Deceased

Archbishop of Bamberg

Apostolic Administrator of Eichstätt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1740³BornGraz
21 Apr 176221.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salzburg, Austria
29 Apr 176221.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
21 Sep 179049.8SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
11 Apr 179150.4ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
13 Nov 179151.0Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
5 Feb 181877.2SelectedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
6 Apr 181877.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
7 Oct 181877.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Eichstätt, Germany
29 Jan 182483.2DiedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph von Stubenberg
Archbishop Joseph von Stubenberg (born , died ) Archbishop of Bamberg

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 104
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016