Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigmund Carl von Castel-Barco

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1661BornLoppio
19 Mar 168726.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
13 Jan 169736.0AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
24 Mar 169736.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
3 Mar 170847.1DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Sigmund Carl von Castel-Barco:
Bishop Sigmund Carl von Castel-Barco (born , died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

  • a priest for 20.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 157
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015