Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael von Kuenburg

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1514Born
21 Jul 155439.8SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
19 Oct 155440.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
6 Jan 155540.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
17 Nov 156046.1DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Michael von Kuenburg:
Archbishop Michael von Kuenburg (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013