Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Federico de Leibnitz

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Nov 1316Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
25 Nov 1316AppointedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
7 Apr 1338DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Federico de Leibnitz (VIAF: 80441661)
Archbishop Federico de Leibnitz (died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 432
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 2 Aug 2020

Quantcast