Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Friedrich Johann Joseph Cölestin zu Cardinal von Schwarzenberg

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1809³BornVienna
23 Jul 183324.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salzburg, Austria
25 Jul 183324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
23 Sep 183526.5SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
1 Feb 183626.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
1 May 183627.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
24 Jan 184232.8Elevated to Cardinal
24 Jan 184232.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
13 Dec 184940.7SelectedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
20 May 185041.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
15 Aug 185041.4InstalledArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
27 Mar 188576.0DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Johann Joseph Cölestin zu von Schwarzenberg:
Cardinal Friedrich Johann Joseph Cölestin zu von Schwarzenberg (born , died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 48.9 years
  • a cardinal for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 468
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 330

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013