Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwig Ebmer (Ebner)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
1476²Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
4 May 1495AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
26 Jul 1495Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
27 Jul 1502ResignedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
4 Dec 1516DiedBishop Emeritus of Chiemsee, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludwig Ebmer (Ebner) (VIAF: 107764415)
Bishop Ludwig Ebmer (Ebner) (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWasserburg am Inn
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1495, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 127
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast