Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert von Priamis

Deceased

Bishop of Lavant, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605Born
9 Dec 162924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
29 Dec 164035.9AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
30 Dec 164035.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
8 Sep 165449.6DiedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Albert von Priamis
Bishop Albert von Priamis (born 1605, died ) Bishop of Lavant

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Maria in Vall Lagerina

  • a priest for 24.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1641, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast