Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Maximilian Joseph Cardinal von Tarnóczy

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1806Born
7 Sep 182821.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salzburg, Austria
25 Oct 182923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
24 Oct 185044.0SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
17 Feb 185144.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
1 Jun 185144.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
22 Dec 187367.1Elevated to Cardinal
4 May 187467.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
4 Apr 187669.4DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Maximilian Joseph von Tarnóczy (VIAF: 40187295)
Maximilian Joseph Cardinal von Tarnóczy (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchwatz, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
Ordained PriestSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
  • a cardinal for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 492, and Page 50
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 29
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1873

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Jan 2017