Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Karl Berg

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1908Born
29 Oct 193324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
26 Dec 197263.9SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
9 Jan 197364.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
25 Feb 197364.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
5 Sep 198879.6RetiredArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
1 Sep 199788.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Karl Berg
Archbishop Karl Berg (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadstadt

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast