Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Ernst von Thun

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1643BornGraz
167733.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
29 Dec 167936.4AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
1680²36.4Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
30 Jun 168743.9SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
24 Nov 168744.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
20 Apr 170965.7DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Ernst von Thun:
Archbishop Johann Ernst von Thun (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 340, and Page 349
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015