Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigmund Ignaz von Wolkenstein-Trostburg

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644Born
168541.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
1 Oct 168743.7AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
24 Apr 168945.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
22 Dec 169652.9DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Sigmund Ignaz von Wolkenstein-Trostburg:
Bishop Sigmund Ignaz von Wolkenstein-Trostburg (died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

  • a priest for 11.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015