Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Beckenschlager

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1427Born
16 May 146538.3AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
13 Jun 146740.4AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
15 Mar 147447.2AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
29 Nov 148154.9SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria
20 Dec 148457.9ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria
21 Mar 148760.2ResignedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
21 Mar 148760.2SucceededArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
15 Jul 148760.5InstalledArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
15 Dec 148962.9DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johann Beckenschlager
Archbishop Johann Beckenschlager (born 1427, died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWroclaw

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast