Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alois Kothgasser, S.D.B.

Archbishop Emeritus of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1937 Born
195517.5ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
9 Feb 196426.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
10 Oct 199760.3AppointedBishop of Innsbruck, Austria
23 Nov 199760.4Ordained BishopBishop of Innsbruck, Austria
27 Nov 200265.4AppointedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
19 Jan 200365.6InstalledArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
4 Nov 201376.4RetiredArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Alois Kothgasser
Archbishop Alois Kothgasser S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSankt Stefan im Rosental

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Salzburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,172
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jul 2017