Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Wolfgang Hannibal Cardinal von Schrattenbach

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1660BornLemberg
26 Jul 168827.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salzburg, Austria
28 Jul 1688³27.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
15 Sep 171151.0SelectedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
23 Dec 171151.2ConfirmedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
27 Feb 171251.4Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
18 May 171251.6Elevated to Cardinal
7 Dec 171454.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
22 Jul 173877.8DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Wolfgang Hannibal von Schrattenbach:
Wolfgang Hannibal Cardinal von Schrattenbach (born , died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
  • a cardinal for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1712
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1712, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015