Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leonhard von Keutschach, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1442Born
146018.0ProfessedMember of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
7 Jul 149553.5SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
13 Nov 149553.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
24 Apr 149654.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
3 Jun 151977.4DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Leonhard von Keutschach (VIAF: 28139443)
Archbishop Leonhard von Keutschach C.R.S.A. (born 1442, died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKlagenfurt

  • a bishop for 23.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 228
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,940

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 May 2018

Quantcast