Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jakob Ernst von Liechtenstein-Kastelkorn

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1690BornHertwigswaldau
Mar 171323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
17 Jan 172837.9AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
14 Mar 172838.1Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
11 Oct 173848.6SelectedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
26 Jan 173948.9ConfirmedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
13 Jan 174554.9SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
13 Sep 174555.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
12 Jun 174757.3DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Jakob Ernst von Liechtenstein-Kastelkorn:
Archbishop Jakob Ernst von Liechtenstein-Kastelkorn (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 349
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 317, and Page 363

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015