Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann von Reisberg

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Feb 1429SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
22 Apr 1429ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
12 Jun 1429Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
30 Sep 1441DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johann von Reisberg:
Archbishop Johann von Reisberg (died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,710
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 432
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013