Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Karl von Kaunitz-Rietberg

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1676BornWien
16 Nov 170428.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
12 Apr 171033.4SelectedBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
1 Jun 171134.5ConfirmedBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
7 Jun 171134.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
27 Aug 171740.8DiedBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Franz Karl von Kaunitz-Rietberg:
Bishop Franz Karl von Kaunitz-Rietberg (born , died ) Bishop of Ljubljana

  • a priest for 12.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015