Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Maximilian Gandolf Cardinal von Kuenburg

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1622³BornGraz
164825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
8 Dec 165432.1AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
1 Aug 165532.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
7 Feb 166542.2AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
30 Jul 166845.7SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
12 Nov 166846.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
2 Sep 168663.8Elevated to Cardinal
3 May 168764.5DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maximilian Gandolf von Kuenburg:
Maximilian Gandolf Cardinal von Kuenburg (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
  • a cardinal for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015